Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lathrop, Melanie C, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jamison, Allan K, against Hernandez, Alex, Blevins, Elgin, represented by Ellis, T Belew, English, Monte J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON ELGIN BLEVINS (I) |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF DISMISSAL CROSS-PLAINTIFF (I) |
|
January 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF DISMISSAL (I) |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T DISMISS/GG |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T DISMISS/RG |
|
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR /GG |
|
December 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O NON SUIT/GG |
|
December 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
November 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR /GG |
|
November 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR T. BELEW EILLIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.