Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Audilia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Munoz, Jacobo G, against Velasquez, Richard, represented by Andrews, Daniel C., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE/CC |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANT ROBIN REAMES D/B/A BLACK O ROSES' |
|
October 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O NON SUIT /GGG |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER /I |
|
August 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR |
|
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR /GG |
|
April 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RPTR'S CERTF ORAL DEPO O AUDILIA FLORES |
|
September 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR/RG |
|
April 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: RICHARD VELASQUEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.