Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Villarreal, Richard, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Munoz, Jacobo G, against Osswald, Lawrence Anthony, represented by Upton, James W, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JOINT MTN T DISMISS W/PREJUDICE/CG |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANT, LAWERANCE ANTHONY OSSWALD'S AMENDED ANSWER/CC |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT LAWRENCE ANTHONY OSSWALD DESIGN O EXPERT WITS /GG |
|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT DESIGNATION O EXPERT WITNESSES |
|
November 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (IMAGE) |
|
November 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NOTICE REGARDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (IMAGE) |
|
October 04, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: LAWRENCE ANTHONY OSSWALD |
|
June 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PER RETURNED MAIL UNDELIVERABLE CITATION ISSUED ON 3/25/04. |
|
May 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE (IMAGE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.