Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Torres, Gracie Ann, Torres, John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Allison, Guy H., against Tradewinds Ford Sales, Inc D B A, Tradewinds Ford Sales, Inc, Crosstown Ford Sales, Inc, Bales Inds Ford Sales,Inc, Scott, represented by Silver, Thomas A, James, Anthony B., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGREED MTN F DISMISS/GG |
|
July 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGREEMENT |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORD GRNTING MTN FOR CONTINUANCE/I |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPORTER'S CERTF DEPOSITION O LARRY POLLOCK, PH.D. 05/20/05/CC |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) *****TRADWINDS FORD SALES D/B/A IMAGED |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGREED MTN F CONTINUANCE/GG |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NTC OF NONSUIT W/OUT PREJ & DISM OF ALL CLAIMS AS TO DF |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FORD SALES INC DBA CROSSTOWN FORD SALES INCS /GG |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT JOHN TORR4ES & GRACIE ANN TORRES NOTC O NONSUIT W/OUT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.