Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alvarado, Rebecca, Alvarado, Mario, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Canales, Hector A., against Medina, Henry, Medina & Medina Group, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith,Inc, represented by Canales, Hector A., Sharp, Joel R, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKlager, James E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2004 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CCR COMPLETE RANGEL LAW FIRM (STEPHANIE DE LA GARZA) F PU |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTF'S AGREED MTN T DISMISS W/PREJUDICE/FP E-FILED |
|
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION (IMAGE) |
|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT RESPO T DFT 2ND SUPLMTL MTN T COMPEL ARBITRATION & MTN |
|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv T COMPEL DISCVY/GG |
|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER (MTN FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT) (IMAGE) |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPLY T PLT RESPO T DFT MTN T COMPEL ARBITRATION/GG |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT 3RD SUPLMTL RESPO T PLT MTN F PARTIAL S/J & DFT 2ND SUPLMTL |
|
May 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANTS' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE T PLFTS' MOTION FOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.