Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Farm 2036, D B A, Gandy, Fi, Jr., Cohen, Martha Ray, Ingraham, David, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Gandy, F I, Jr., against Gulf Coast Cooperative Gin, represented by Mclaren, Gary R., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2004 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
November 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPTR CERTF DEPO O F.I, GANDY JR /GG |
|
October 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT 1ST AMD ANS SUBJ T OBJT T VENUE & MTN T TRANSFER VENUE |
|
September 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT DESIGN O EXPERT WITS/GG |
|
September 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT 2ND SUPLMTL RESPO T DFT REQ F DISCLSOURE/GG |
|
September 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT 4TH AMD ORIG PTN/GG (EJ) - . |
|
September 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT DESIGN O EXPERT WITS /GG |
|
August 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MTN TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL GRANTED TO FRANCIS I GANDY |
|
August 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T SUBS CNSL/GG |
|
June 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv VOID - . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.