Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Isenburg, Sally, Isenburg, Jack, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Mclallen, Douglas Dewitt, against Champion Ford, Inc, Ford Motor Co, represented by Barre, Denny, Patrick, Craig M, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2004 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F DISMISS W/PREJUDICE /GG |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CHAMPION FORD MAZDA DESIGN O EXPERT WITS/GG |
|
December 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT'S 1ST DESIG OF EX WITNESSES/RG |
|
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SETTING DC 02-24-05 JT 02-28-04 |
|
April 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: CHAMPION FORD, INC. |
|
March 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT FORD MOTOR CO 1ST AMD ORIG ANS/GG |
|
March 11, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: FORD MOTOR CO. |
|
March 11, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION TO TRANSFER: FORD MOTOR CO. Issue Date: 03/11/2004 |
|
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (R): FORD MOTOR CO. SERVED: 03/02/2004 FILED: 03/10/2004 Issue Date: 02/25/2004 File Date: 03/10/2004 Service Date: 03/02/2004 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.