Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vong, Kiu Tong, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Herrmann, Gregory H, against Gignac, Jan Mason, represented by English, Monte J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVargas, Robert J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR /GG |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEPO OF MELIZA REYES RECORS OF CHRISTUS SPOHN MEMORIAL/CG |
|
September 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTS DESIGNATION O EXPRT WITS/CG |
|
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGREEMENT/GCV |
|
August 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPORTER'S CERTF DEPOSITION O KIU TONG VONG FEB 11, 2005/CC |
|
August 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT STIPULATION O LIABILTY /GG |
|
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT 1ST AMD ORIG PTN/GG (EJ) - . |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORAL DEPOSITION OF JAN MASON GIGNAC 5/13/05/GG |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O INT TK DEPO B W/QUES C/R F CHRISTUS SPOHN FAM HLTH CTR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.