Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Whitfield, Brian A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Herrmann, Gregory H, against Christian, Andre L, represented by English, Monte J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT 1ST AMD ORIG ANS/GG |
|
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT DESIGN O EXPERT WTIS/GG |
|
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTS DESIGNATION O EXPRT WITS/CG |
|
July 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O INT TK DEPO B W/QUES C/R F DR JACQUELINE E COHN ET,AL |
|
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT RESPO T DFT ANDRE L CHRISTIAN MTN F S/J /GG |
|
December 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMNT |
|
December 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY FEE: Pd. by MONTE J. ENGLISH Issue Date: 12/06/2004 |
|
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: ANDRE L. CHRISTIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.