Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Joubert, Lanette Smith, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joubert, Lanette Smith, against Stender, Monica, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NOTICE OF HEARING (IMAGE) |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT MTN T DISMISS & SANCTIONS/GG |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC OF CHANGE OF CHILD PLACEMENT |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT MTN T COMPEL DISCVY/GG |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR MONICA STENDER |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT REQ F DISCLOSURE/GG |
|
August 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT/CNTR PLT MONICA STENDER 1ST SET O INTEROGS T PLT/CNTR DFT |
|
August 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LANETTE SMITH JOUBERT/GG |
|
August 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT/CNTR PLT MOINICA STENDER 1ST REQ F PRODN O DOCS/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.