Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Betco Scaffold, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gilbreath, Stavis, against Hodson, Dixie, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: BETCO SCAFFOLD Issue Date: 01/02/2006 |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFORMATION SERVICE SHEET REQ ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT/CP |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LETTER REQ AJ/CP |
|
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT /GG |
|
October 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
October 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT MTN F DEFAULT JGMT/GG |
|
January 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CN2): DIXIE HODSON SERVED: 01/31/2004 FILED: 02/02/2004 Served By: JERRY BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/28/2004 File Date: 02/02/2004 Service Date: 01/31/2004 |
|
January 28, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION (CN2): DIXIE HODSON SERVED: 01/31/2004 FILED: 02/02/2004 Served By: JERRY BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/28/2004 File Date: 02/02/2004 Service Date: 01/31/2004 | |
January 20, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
January 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/RG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.