Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Regent, Anh, against Na, Na N, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC /GG |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COPY: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. Issue Date: 10/17/2008 |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
January 20, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): NA N NA SERVED: Issue Date: 01/20/2004 | |
January 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): NA N NA SERVED: Issue Date: 01/20/2004 |
|
January 19, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
January 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
January 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REQ F DISCLOSURES & REQ F ADM/DM - . |
|
January 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL INFORM SHEET/DM - . |
|
January 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC INFORM SHEET/DM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.