Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Camelia, Flores, Richahrd, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gonzalez, Hector Rene, against Ortiz, Jessica R, Ortiz, David, represented by English, Monte J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANTS' TRIAL FACT WITNESS LIST/CC |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT MTN I LIMINE /GG |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CHRG O COURT /GG |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR /GG |
|
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFT'S DESIGNATION O EXPERTS/CC |
|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT DESIGN O EXPERT WITS /GG |
|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT 2ND AMD ORIG ANS /GG |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANTS' FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER/CC |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF RECORDS PERTAINING T: CAMELIA FLORES/CC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.