Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Linda Castillo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gonzalez, Hector Rene, against Merritt, Edward Ellis, Jr., represented by Silver, Thomas A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
October 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY FEE: Pd. by THOMAS A. SILVER Issue Date: 08/29/2005 |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: EDWARD ELLIS JR. MERRITT |
|
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT O SANTOS RONJE /GG |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFFIDAVIT/CP |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTING MTN FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE (IMAGE) |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT'S MOTIN FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE/CP |
|
December 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT'S MTN F SUBSTITUTED SVC./DM WALKED T CRT BY HECOTR GONZALE |
|
December 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORD GRNTNG MTN FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE (I) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.