Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vela, Rose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVela, Rose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF F KIDS SAKE SEMINAR; JOSE L IBARRA [FAX]/GG |
|
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: MONICA SAUCEDO IBARRA |
|
January 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CN2): MONICA SAUCEDO IBARRA SERVED: 01/18/2005 FILED: 01/20/2005 Served By: JERRY BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/17/2005 File Date: 01/20/2005 Service Date: 01/18/2005 |
|
January 17, 2005 | Docket Event | CITATION (CN2): MONICA SAUCEDO IBARRA SERVED: 01/18/2005 FILED: 01/20/2005 Served By: JERRY BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/17/2005 File Date: 01/20/2005 Service Date: 01/18/2005 | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING SERVICE/JAU |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVT O INDIG/LP |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PRO SE NTC/LP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.