Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Banales, J. Manuel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBanales, J. Manuel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 1111 P 1111-1111 |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O N/SUIT /RG |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAMILY LAW CASE INFO SHEET/AMD |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE INFO SHEET/AMD |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BVS FORM/AMD |
|
January 01, 1900 | Docket Event |
01/01/1900 Case Event Conv DISMISSAL NOTICE (01 pgs.) Service Date: 04/07/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.