Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sherman Acquisition Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christian, Bryan P., against Otto, Dennis P, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
De-Activate Case (OCA) Case in suspended status |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF TRANSFER TO SUSPENSE DOCKET (I) |
|
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O BNCY FILING |
|
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CN2): DENNIS P. OTTO SERVED: 01/13/2005 FILED: 01/17/2005 Served By: JERRY BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/10/2005 File Date: 01/17/2005 Service Date: 01/13/2005 |
|
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event | CITATION (CN2): DENNIS P. OTTO SERVED: 01/13/2005 FILED: 01/17/2005 Served By: JERRY BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/10/2005 File Date: 01/17/2005 Service Date: 01/13/2005 | |
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET MAILED |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LETTER WITH SVC INSTRUCTIONS/CP |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFORMATION SERVICE SHEET REQ SVC/CP |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.