Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Daniels, Natasha, represented by Davila, Frank G, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Greenwell, Thomas F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreenwell, Thomas F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2004 |
CategorySeizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F COA:APPEAL DISMISSED;MANDATE ENCLSD |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv APPELLANT'S MTN T DISMISS APPEAL GRANTED,MEMO/JDGMNT ENCLSD |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORD. DENYING MTN. TO SET ASIDE JUDGMNT & NEW TRIAL (S) |
|
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CLERK'S RECORD SENT TO 13TH COA |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BILL OF COST |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O APPEALS TIMELY MAILED ON 04/19/07. |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPORTER'S COPY SENT TO 319TH CRT |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F ATTY FRANK DAVILA: ENCLOSING NTC O APPEAL, CLERK'S REC, |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPORTER'S REC AND COPY TO SENT BACK |
|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT'S MTN T SHOW AUTHORITY T ACT/JM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.