Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vela, Rose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVela, Rose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CCR COMPLETE RACARDO AMADOR F PU/SH |
|
August 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DWOP NOTICES MAILED |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAMILY CASE INFO SHEET/JAU |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BVS FORM/JAU |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING NO SERVICE/JAU |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
January 01, 1900 | Docket Event |
01/01/1900 Case Event Conv JUDGMENT NOTICE (01 pgs.) Service Date: 09/02/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.