Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2004 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
December 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF F KIDS SAKE SEMIANR: DAVID A TOVAR [FAX]/GG |
|
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: KIMBERLY TOVAR & JONATHAN TOVAR BY AMICUS ATTY |
|
November 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NOTICE OF HRNG (I) |
|
November 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTY AD LITEM JACKIE |
|
November 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) CHAPA (I) |
|
November 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (I) |
|
November 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F APPOINTMNT O ATTY AD LITEM /GG |
|
November 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: DAVID A. TOVAR |
|
November 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F CNSL /GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.