Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces, County Of, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Linebarger, Goggan, Blair &Amp; Sampson, Llp, against Phillips, Edie, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2004 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE OF NON-SUIT |
|
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv (ORIG) RELEASE OF JUDGEMENT /CC |
|
October 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (R): EDIE PHILLIPS SERVED: 11/12/2004 FILED: 11/29/2004 Served By: TRAVIS COUNTY OCS Issue Date: 10/29/2004 File Date: 11/29/2004 Service Date: 11/12/2004 |
|
October 29, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION (R): EDIE PHILLIPS SERVED: 11/12/2004 FILED: 11/29/2004 Served By: TRAVIS COUNTY OCS Issue Date: 10/29/2004 File Date: 11/29/2004 Service Date: 11/12/2004 | |
October 22, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
October 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.