Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credigy Receivables Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ditsch, Karen, against Heslep, Robert S, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Greenwell, Thomas F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreenwell, Thomas F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CN1): ROBERT S. HESLEP, JR. SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 09/09/2004 Served By: RUDY CACERES CN1 Issue Date: 08/25/2004 File Date: 09/09/2004 |
|
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION (CN1): ROBERT S. HESLEP, JR. SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 09/09/2004 Served By: RUDY CACERES CN1 Issue Date: 08/25/2004 File Date: 09/09/2004 | |
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JAU |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING SERVICE/JAU |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.