Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hendrickson, Alvin, Gonzales, Teodirlo Salvador, Davis, Troy T, Celestine, Charles, Beltran, Salvador Pena, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Steckler, Bruce W, against Pyramex Safety Products, Llc, Humble Sand Co, Inc, Vallen Corp, Ottawa Silica Co, Pennsylvania Glass Sand Corp, (total of 88) See All represented by Yates, Stacy Kay, Riley, James M., Jr., Brill, David, Sharp, David E, Milby, Mitchell S, (total of 34) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2004 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Copy Order Of Dismissal Under Section 90.010 (d-1), Tex.Civ. Prac. & Rem.Code/ Salvador T. Gonzales |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copy Order of Dismissal Exposed Person: Troy T Davis |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copy Order of Dismissal Exposed Person: Emerico Garcia |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copy Order of Dismissal Exposed Person: William A Hendrickson |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Courtesy Copy Order of Dismissal |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copy Order of Dismissal Exposed Person: Jimmy Wayne Atkins |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copy Order of Dismissal Exposed Person: Salvador Pena Beltran |
|
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F VAC/GG |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv TRANSFER FEES: QUINCY COMPRESSORS Issue Date: 11/16/2005 |
|
August 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv TEXAS, INC.'S DESIGNATION O MARK E. LEWIS AS ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.