Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mayorga, Grace, Martinez, Grace, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sames, Wj, against Petru A Petrila Family Partnership Ltd, Shelly, Michael J, represented by Calhoun, Wilson, Crago, David H, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vela, Rose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION T DISMISS/CC |
|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG - 0000000 |
|
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANT DEFTS MTN SUMMARY JUDGMENT A/T M. SHELLY ONLY (I) |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT LIST O TRIAL WIT/RP |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv OBJECTION T DESIGNATION O EXPERT WITNESS/CC |
|
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT O EXPERT WITS O DFT THE PETRU A PETRILA FAM PRTNSHIP LTD |
|
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANT, MICHAEL J. HELLY'S TRIAL FACT WITNESS LIST/CC |
|
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT MICHAEL J SHELLY DESIGN O EXPERT WITS/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.