Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
French Ellison Truck Center, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Henkel, C M, Iii, against Morales, Leopoldo, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vela, Rose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DWOP NOTICES MAILED |
|
July 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv O ANY DEFICIENCY OWED T FRENCY ELLISON TRUCK CENTER LTD/LP |
|
July 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F FRENCH-ELLISON TRUCK CENTER, LTD RE STLMT F HOME STATE CO - . |
|
July 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MUTUAL INS CO & ENDORSEMENT O PURSUING LEOPOLDO MOARLES JR |
|
May 11, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MTN FOR RULE 103 (I) |
|
April 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F RULE 103/GG |
|
April 27, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): LEOPOLDO MORALES SERVED: 07/24/2004 FILED: 08/05/2004 Served By: WEBB CNTY SVC/SANTIAGO CRUZ OTH Issue Date: 04/27/2004 File Date: 08/05/2004 Service Date: 07/24/2004 | |
April 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): LEOPOLDO MORALES SERVED: 07/24/2004 FILED: 08/05/2004 Served By: WEBB CNTY SVC/SANTIAGO CRUZ OTH Issue Date: 04/27/2004 File Date: 08/05/2004 Service Date: 07/24/2004 |
|
April 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC INFO SHEET: NO SVC REQ/EGM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.