Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mako Financial Of Corpus Christi, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barre, Denny, against Luna, Francisco L, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation SHOW CAUSE (R): FRANCISCO L LUNA SERVED: Issue Date: 01/14/2005 |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SHOW CAUSE (R): FRANCISCO L LUNA SERVED: Issue Date: 01/14/2005 |
|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER TO SH CS (I) |
|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR ATTORNEY WITH SERVICE INSTRUCTIONS/JAU |
|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING SERVICE/JAU |
|
November 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SHOW CAUSE (R): FRANCISCO L LUNA SERVED: Issue Date: 11/18/2004 |
|
November 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation SHOW CAUSE (R): FRANCISCO L LUNA SERVED: Issue Date: 11/18/2004 |
|
November 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LETTER WITH SVC INSTRUCTIONS/CP |
|
November 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFORMATION SERVICE SHEET REQ SVC/CP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.