Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holsonback, John C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Greenwell, Andrew M, against Collingsworth, Travis, represented by Dorn, Gail D C, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JOINT MTN T DISMISS W/PREJUDICE /GG |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AT 8:30AM |
|
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ENTRY OF JUDGMENT HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 20, 2005 |
|
August 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv TRIAL STG REMOVED 8/29/05; 9/12/05 SETTLEMENT DOC |
|
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RESCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 11, 2005 AT 8:30AM |
|
June 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ---AM STTLMNT CONF 8/4/05 @ 8:30 AM |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.C.O.-J TRIAL 8/29/05 @ 9:00 AM PRE TRIAL CONF 8/18/05 @ 8:30 |
|
July 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY FEE: Pd. by GAIL D. C. DORN Issue Date: 07/06/2004 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.