Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kampfer, Derrick, Kampfer, Larry, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Webb, Charles C., Jr., against Kampfer,Jr, Larry, Neisser, Amanda, Dietze, Thomas, represented by Hill, Randy W, Silver, Thomas A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (I) |
|
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANT, THOMAS DIETZE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/CC |
|
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T W/DRAW AS ATTY REC'D/GG |
|
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ---CONF 09/29/05 @ 8:30AM |
|
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DCO; JT 11/14/05 @ 9:OOAM P-TRIAL 11/03/05 @ 8:30AM SETTLEMENT |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT AMANDA NEISSER DESIGN O EXPERTS/GG |
|
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT DESIGN O EXPERT WITS/JM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.