Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Labatto, Cathy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Williams, Michael W, against Menn, Russell, represented by Henkel, C M, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
April 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COUNTER CLAIM: RUSSELL MENN Issue Date: 04/13/2004 |
|
April 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: RUSSELL MENN |
|
March 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CM): RUSSELL MENN SERVED: 03/31/2004 FILED: 04/01/2004 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 03/23/2004 File Date: 04/01/2004 Service Date: 03/31/2004 |
|
March 23, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION (CM): RUSSELL MENN SERVED: 03/31/2004 FILED: 04/01/2004 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 03/23/2004 File Date: 04/01/2004 Service Date: 03/31/2004 | |
March 16, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
March 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
March 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ SVC/JM |
|
March 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.