Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rusche Fuel Controls, D B A, Susser Petroleum Co, Lp, D B Aq, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Duncan, Scott J., against Wilson, A K A, Hugo Herrera, Herrera, Hugo, Rocha, Gilberto, S-Mall Express, represented by Martinez, Adrian R., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT'S 2ND AMD PTN/JAU (EJ) - . |
|
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) HERRERA WILSON I |
|
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CLAIMS AGAINST HUGO HERRERA A/K/A HUGO |
|
September 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/CG |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION I |
|
July 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT SUSSER PETROLEUM CO LP DBA RUSCHE DISTRIBUTING CO MTN F S/J |
|
July 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT MOTION T COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
July 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGAINST DFT HUGO HERRERA AKA HUGO HERRERA WILSON/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.