Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Segura, Teresita, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Turman, Greg W, against Electronic Products Distribution, Llc, Walgreens Co, Abflex, Usa, Inc, Ab Energizer, Llc, represented by Kennamer, Alison D., Mickits, Kevin F., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGREED MTN T DISMISS ALL CLAIMS /GG |
|
October 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COURT COPY FR CHRISTUS SPOHN MEMORIAL HOSP /JM |
|
October 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COURT COPY FR ACS PRIMARY CARE PHYS SW /JM |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
September 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFFTDAVIT CONCRING COST & NECCESITY O SERV/CG |
|
September 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COURT COPY FR CHRISTUS PSOHN MEMORIAL HSOP |
|
September 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COURT COPY FR CARDIOLOGY ASSOC /GG |
|
September 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
September 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COURT COPY FR CHRSITUS SPOHN FAM HLTH CTR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.