Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Weaver, William P, Jr., against Lee, Lisa R, Rivera, Josephine, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF NONSUIT (AS TO LISA LEE) (I) |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE O NONSUIT/CC |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
December 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO JOSEPHINE RIVERA (SCANNED) |
|
December 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O DISMISS/GG |
|
April 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
April 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: JOSEPHINE RIVERA |
|
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): JOSEPHINE RIVERA SERVED: 04/05/2004 FILED: 04/07/2004 Served By: PROFESSIONAL CIVIL PROCESS CP17 Issue Date: 02/24/2004 File Date: 04/07/2004 Service Date: 04/05/2004 |
|
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): LISA R. LEE SERVED: Issue Date: 02/24/2004 | |
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): LISA R. LEE SERVED: Issue Date: 02/24/2004 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.