Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gomez, Jose M, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Guerra, Jerry, against Texas South, Inc, Texas South Rentals, Inc, A K A, Daniell, Douglas G, The Hertz Corporation, represented by Hawn, Bruce S, Rangel, Jorge C., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2004 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv (1 MANILA ENV); HERTZ CORP'S SUPPLMNTL BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv OPPOSTN T MTN F CLASS CERTIF (1 MANILA ENV)---RECD BY ARNOLD |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv THE CRT'S AUG 24, 2006 LTR (1 MANILA ENV); AFFIDAVITS IN |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv HAND-DEL F COA: ORG EXHIBITS; HERTZ CORP'S OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv 1ST AMEND MTN F CLASS CERTIF (1 MANILA ENV); PLTF'S 4TH |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AMEND CLAS ACTION PTN & PLFT'S 1ST AMEND MTN F CLASS CERTIF |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FILE 1-4 T 214TH CRT / GRACIE |
|
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F COA: JDGMNT O TRL CRT REV & REMANDED: MANDATE ENCLSD |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F COA: JDGMNT O TRL CRT REVRSD & REMANDED; OPINION ENCLSD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.