Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ybarra, Karen, Ybarra, David, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Dyer, Curtis B., against Germania Farm Mutual Ins, represented by Doyle, Don W., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vela, Rose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2004 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
December 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T DISMISS/GG |
|
October 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv THE ORAL DEPO O DAVID YBARRA /GG |
|
June 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT O DAVID YBARRA /GG |
|
June 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT RESPO T DFT MTN F S/J /GG |
|
May 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT MTN F S/J /GG |
|
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O INT TK DEPO B W/QUES C/R F STREEM CO ET,AL |
|
May 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT DESIGN O EXPERT WITS/GG |
|
May 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
April 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT SPECL EXCPETIONS T PLT ORIG PTN/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.