Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chapa, Chiva, Chapa, Damien A Vasquez, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Vasquez, Steven Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2004 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
January 02, 2006 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): STEVEN ANTHONY VASQUEZ SERVED: Issue Date: 01/02/2006 | |
January 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): STEVEN ANTHONY VASQUEZ SERVED: Issue Date: 01/02/2006 |
|
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING SERVICE/JAU |
|
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SECOND AMD PTN IN SUIT AFFECTING P/C REL/JAU |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ATTY CERTF O LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDR/GG |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PTN MTN F DEFAULT JGMT/GG |
|
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MOTION TO REINSTATE CAUSE ON COURT'S DOCKET GRANTED(I) |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PTN MTN T REINSTATE/GG |
|
December 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.