Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Canales, Linda, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Shepherd, Boyd W, against Gulley, Robert Bryan, Dds, represented by Woolsey, Richard C., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPTR CERTF DEPO O ROXANNE ROBERTSON DDS /GG |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPTR CERTF ORAL/VIDEO DEPO O BILL DON TINER MD , DDS /GG |
|
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT MTN F NON SUIT /GG |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT ROBERT BRYAN GULLEY DDS MTN I LIMINE /GG |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT ROBERT BRYAN GULLEY XHBT LIST/GG |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT ROBERT BRYAN GULLEY DDS TRIAL FACT WITS LIST/GG |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CORUT CHRG /GG |
|
April 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O DELIVERY RE; ROXANNE ROBERTSON DDS /GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.