Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Washington, Gyanne, Washington, David, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Sixta, John A, Jr., against Kesev Prperties, Inc, Lipman, William, De La Garza, Wayne, represented by Izen, Joe Alfred, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Greenwell, Thomas F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2004 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: GYANNE WASHINGTON Issue Date: 08/17/2009 |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC FORM REQ AJS/RM |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LTR REQ (2) AJS/RM |
|
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER FOR APPLICATION FOR CONFIRMATION OF AWARD (S) |
|
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) APPLICATION FOR CONFIRMATION & AWARDS & ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORDER DISMISS W/PREJ. TO DF. WILLIAM LIPMAN ONLY (S) |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv APPLICATION F CONFIRMATION O AWARD & ENTRY O JGMT /GG |
|
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION TO SEVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.