Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chapa, Antonio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cevallos, Mark A, against Mills, Wilton, represented by English, Monte J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Greenwell, Thomas F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANT'S MOTION T RETURN CASE T COURT DOCKET & T |
|
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ENFORCE SETTLEMENT/CC |
|
August 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPORTER'S CERTF DEPOSITIOHN O ANTONIO CHAPA 01/14/2005/CC |
|
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv OFFCRS CERTF C/R F GILBERT MEADOWS MD /GG |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv OFFICERS CERTF PURSUANT T TEXAS RULE O CIVIL PROCEDURE 203/CC |
|
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv OFFCRS CERTV C/R F JOHN P MASCIALE MD |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv OFCR CERT PURSUANT T TX RL O CIVIL PROCEDURE 203/RP |
|
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O INTEN T TK DEPO BY WRTN QUEST CC RADIOLOGY CEN INC/RG |
|
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O INTEN T TK DEPO B WRTN QUEST JOHN P MASCIALE MD/RG - . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.