Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lott, Tenella, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Webb, Charles C., Jr., against Ramirez, Gilbert, represented by English, Monte J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vela, Rose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORAL/VIDEO DEPO O RAYMOND ACEBO MD /GG |
|
November 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT 1ST NOTC O FILING AFDVITS/GG - 000000000000000 |
|
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT 1ST AMD ORIG ANS/GG |
|
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT GILBERT RAMIREZ AMD DESIGN O FACT TRIAL WITS/GG |
|
November 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O INT TK DEPO B WQ/UES C/R F DR RAYMOND ACEBO /GG |
|
November 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT SUPLMTL DESIGN O TRIAL WITS/GG |
|
November 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT DESIGN O TRIAL WITS/GG |
|
November 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AMD NOTC O INT TK DEPO B W/QUES C/R F RADIOLOGY ASSOC ET,AL |
|
November 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O INT TK DEPO B W/QUES C/R F RADIOLOGY ASSOC ET,AL - 000000000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.