Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Holland, Barry, represented by Ellison, Scott M, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2004 |
CategorySeizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS |
|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS OF DEFT |
|
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv STATE'S EXHIBIT 1 THRU STATE'S EXHIBIT 17 PHOTOS |
|
August 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AS ATTY OF RECORD----SCANNED |
|
August 04, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T W/DRAW AS CNSL/GG |
|
February 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: BARRY HOLLAND |
|
January 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (CN2): BARRY HOLLAND SERVED: 01/21/2004 FILED: 01/23/2004 Served By: JERRY BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/14/2004 File Date: 01/23/2004 Service Date: 01/21/2004 |
|
January 14, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (CN2): BARRY HOLLAND SERVED: 01/21/2004 FILED: 01/23/2004 Served By: JERRY BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/14/2004 File Date: 01/23/2004 Service Date: 01/21/2004 | |
January 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVL CASE INFO/LE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.