Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
De La Garza, John, De La Garza, Juan, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Rodriguez F K A, Maria L, De La Garza, Maria Leonarda, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 1971 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify-Other (OCA) Petition to Modify P/C/R |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.