Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wiginton, Billie J, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Bruegger, Joseph F., against Zonolite Co, Wr Grace & Co, Texas Vermiculite Co, Dewey & Almy Chemical Co, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2001 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC/GG |
|
February 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv WAIVER O ARRAIGNMENT/GG |
|
July 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CV CASE INFO SHEET/LP |
|
June 25, 2001 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
June 25, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LITIGANT(S) SEVERED FROM CAUSE# 98-06381-00-0 |
|
June 25, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORDER OF SEVERANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.