Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Soliz, Jose, Reyes, Jose, Miller, Clemon, Hinojosa, Rodolfo, Hinojosa, Gabriel, (total of 12) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Roque, Gerald E., against Texas Industrial Minerals Co, Us Silica Co Of Texas, Pennsylvinia Glass Sand Corp, Us Silica Co, Ruemelin Mfg Co, Inc, (total of 78) See All represented by Till, Allen R, Vance, Vanessa L., Zwernemann, Gerald R, Taylor, Thomas B., Rayburn, Mark D., (total of 33) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2001 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFTS'S NOTICE O NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE/CC |
|
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) INC. SURVIVAIR A DIVISION OF U.S.D. CORP. UNOPPOSED MTN TO |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISS ALL CROSS-CLAIMS (I) |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC. SANSTORM INC. BOWEN TOOLS |
|
November 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BIG THREE INDUST INC ET,AL UNOPPOSED MTN T DISMISS ALL X-CLAIMS |
|
October 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) N SURVIVAIR A DIVISION OF U.S.D. CORP. (I) |
|
October 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC. SANSTORM INC. BOWEN TOOLS INC. |
|
October 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORDER ON PLANITIFF NOTICE OF NONSUIT AS TO DEFTS |
|
October 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O NON SUIT/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.