Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Benavidez, Naomi, Benavidez, Roman, Iii, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Wyatt, Robert L, Perkes, Gregory T, Trevino, Jerry Joel, against Pearl, Bill H, Productions, Inc, Diaz Welding & Leasing Service, Diaz, Edilorio, represented by Chaves, Douglas E, Gonzales, Rudy, Jr., Villarreal, Marc E, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2001 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTING MTN TO W/DRAW (OF DAVID DIAZ) (I) |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN TO WITHDRAW WALKED UP/JJM |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO W/DRAW (I) |
|
March 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION T WITHDRAW/CC |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT 2ND SUPLMTL DESIGN O EXPERT WITS /GG |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOC O TELEPHONE D.C.C. |
|
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (I) |
|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MANDATE-DWOJ/LP |
|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv OPINION & JDMT F CT O APPLS/LP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.