Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Texas State Of, Garza, Juanita A, Gonzalez, Leopoldo B, Avalos, Eusebio, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Attorney General, Skelnik, Mary, against Ytuhbia, Linda Sue, Yturria, Gilbert, Standard Oil Co, Exxon Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, (total of 105) See All represented by Attorney General, Maston, Karen K., Danish, Teri L., Elliston, Gary D, Feeney, Christi Dickson, (total of 28) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2001 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/NTC OF ADMIN-NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PAYEE |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT OF DEFT UNION CARBIDE CORP. (I) |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION FOR NON-SUIT O DEFENDANT UNION CARRIDE CORPORATION/CC |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT ASTEN INC MTN F SUBS O CNSL /GG |
|
June 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL-DEFT GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP (I) |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGREED JUDG FOR EXEC IN FILE #8 |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation ALIAS EXECUTION (R): OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. SERVED: Issue Date: 05/15/2006 |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ALIAS EXECUTION (R): OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. SERVED: Issue Date: 05/15/2006 |
|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFORMATION SERVICE SHEET REQ AJ/CP |
|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LETTER REQ WRIT OF EXECUTION/CP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.