Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nabarrete, Florencia, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Xavier V. Chavez, against Gamez, Juan A., Nabarrete, Joel, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Return of Service
Date: August 25, 2023Affidavit
Date: August 25, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 06, 2023Signed Order
Date: September 07, 2023Request For Service
Date: July 28, 2023E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Signed Order for Motion for Citation by Publication Signed Order |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Citation by Posting Motion (No Fee) |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Executed- Return of Service- Juan Gamez Return of Service |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Nonservice- Joel Nabarrete Affidavit |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CitationGamez, Juan A.Served08/03/2023Returned08/25/2023 | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CitationNabarrete, Joel Returned Unserved 08/25/2023Returned08/25/2023 | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Service- Juan A. Gamez Request For Service |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition for Partition of Real Estate and Request for Declaratory Judgment E-Filed Original Petition Document |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.