Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Comercia Bank, A Texas Banking Association, Successor In Interest By Merger With Sterling Bank, Comerica Bank, A Texas Banking Association, Successor In Interest By Merger With Sterling Bank, filed a(n) Other Civil - Over $250,000 case represented by Chuck Serafino, Victor C. Serafino, against Schroeder, Larry F., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: September 29, 2023Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Date: September 12, 2023Return of Service
Date: September 21, 2023Notice of Nonsuit
Date: September 21, 2023Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: September 22, 2023Request For Service
Date: May 30, 2023E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: May 24, 2023Affidavit
Date: May 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit without Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation- Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Return of Service |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. without Prejudice Notice of Nonsuit |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Injunction or Show Cause (OCA) |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
f/c Writ of Garnishment After Judgment - Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Request For Service |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of GarnishmentWells Fargo Bank, N.A.Served06/05/2023Returned09/21/2023 | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment E-Filed Original Petition Document |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of V. Charles Serafino Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.