Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Saji, George, Yansen, Marisa, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Keval Patel, against Zeus Mortgage Ltd D B A Zeuslending.Com, represented by C. Elaine Howard, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Bench Trial
Date: April 01, 2024E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: May 08, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: July 24, 2023Original Answer
Date: July 21, 2023Return of Service
Date: June 29, 2023Request For Service
Date: May 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Docket Control Order |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Zeus Mortgage LTD d/b/a ZeusLending.com's Original Answer Original Answer |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Executed- Citation- Zeus Mortgage LTD d/b/a ZeusLending Return of Service |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation-Standard - Zeus Mortgage LTD d/b/a ZeusLending Request For Service |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CitationZeus Mortgage LTD d/b/a ZeusLending.comServed06/28/2023Returned06/29/2023 | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CitationZeus Mortgage LTD d/b/a ZeusLending.com Unserved | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition E-Filed Original Petition Document |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.