Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Garcia Arroyo, Alma Madai, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by J. Terrelle Bynum, Michelle Acosta, against Jimenez, Muhammad Aly, represented by Michael J Griffin, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Kristin Bays presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Return of Service
Date: July 03, 2023Notice
Date: September 26, 2023Jury Trial
Date: March 04, 2024Notice of Representation
Date: August 17, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: June 29, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: June 16, 2023Signed Order
Date: June 16, 2023Original Answer
Date: June 28, 2023Proposed Order
Date: June 16, 2023Request For Service
Date: May 10, 2023E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: May 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Formal Notice of Filing of Affidavits and Records as to Necessity of Services and R Notice |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel Notice of Representation |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation to Muhammad Aly Jimenez Return of Service |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer and Demand for Jury Trial Original Answer |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Requested | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service on Defendant Muhammad Aly Jimenez Motion (No Fee) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.