Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Olen Manning, Iii, against Breiten, Billy L, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Scharlene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2023 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial Debt - Under $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Order to Appoint
Date: September 21, 2023Default Judgment
Date: July 10, 2023Letters
Date: May 02, 2023Return of Service
Date: May 10, 2023Motion for Default Judgment
Date: June 29, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 20, 2023Request For Service
Date: May 02, 2023E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: May 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Post-Judgment Receiver Robert E. Jenkins Pursuant to CPRC 31.002 (Limited Receivers Order to Appoint |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Post-Judgment Receiver Robert E. Jenkins Pursuant to Texas Civil Motion (No Fee) |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation - Billy L Breiten Return of Service |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CitationBreiten, Billy LServed05/10/2023Returned05/10/2023 | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Letters |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Service- Billy L Breiten Request For Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.